This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/14/2020 at 12:47:45 (UTC).

Tania Campbell vs Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Tania Campbell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0941

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPBELL, TANIA

Defendant

OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DYAL, ABBY R.

GAULDEN, FRANK HEWITT

CANNIZZARO, JOHN PAUL

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL & PRETRIAL

10/22/2020: ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL & PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

3/12/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

3/2/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/14/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

3/31/2020: DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

7/15/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

3/12/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

3/12/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

3/31/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE DEEFNDANT'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

2/6/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE DEEFNDANT'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 3.27.20 AT 1:30 PM

1/21/2020: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 3.27.20 AT 1:30 PM

Notice of Appearance TANIA CAMPBELL

7/30/2019: Notice of Appearance TANIA CAMPBELL

Notice of Appearance

7/15/2019: Notice of Appearance

Order Appointing Mediator

3/25/2019: Order Appointing Mediator

Trial Set Memorandum

3/25/2019: Trial Set Memorandum

Notice of Service Plaintiffs

10/19/2018: Notice of Service Plaintiffs

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC

9/6/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC

Civil Cover Sheet

9/6/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: Final Pre Trial Conference/Civil; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE DEEFNDANT'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 3.27.20 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF S REQUESTS FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: Request for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice Defendant's Notice of Compliance with Plaintiff's Request for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Production/To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Serving Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Outback Steakhouse of Florida, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Serving Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Production/To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dyal, Abby Robinson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gaulden, Frank Hewitt