This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 19:27:37 (UTC).

SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO INC vs.KEVIN FAIRBANKS

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KEVIN FAIRBANKS. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0270

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROLFE, LAWRENCE C

SWIFT TRANSPORTATION CO INC

Defendant

FAIRBANKS, KEVIN D

Garnishee

SOUTHEASTERN FREIGHT LINES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROLFE, LAWRENCE C

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service of Garnishment paperwork

8/24/2018: Certificate of Service of Garnishment paperwork

Certificate of Service

6/21/2018: Certificate of Service

Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's fees

6/20/2018: Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's fees

Affidavit of Lost Original

6/20/2018: Affidavit of Lost Original

Default issued from efile

5/30/2018: Default issued from efile

Default

5/23/2018: Default

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

4/17/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

Civil Cover Sheet

4/16/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: Satisfaction original to recording with fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee as to Southeastern Freight as garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee Southeastern Freight - garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous Cover Letter dtd 2/27/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: Amended Motion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Executed Summons Returned summons individually served Kevin Fairbanks on 4/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHEASTERN FREIGHT LINES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Swift Transportation Co., LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rolfe, Lawrence C