This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/13/2020 at 16:52:00 (UTC).

SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. vs Unknown Spouse of Ross C. Lansing

Case Summary

On 03/27/2018 SunTrust Mortgage, Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Unknown Spouse of Ross C Lansing. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. and FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0290

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC.

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROSS C. LANSING

LANSING, ROSS C

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

 

Court Documents

Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

3/27/2018: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

Notice of Appearance

12/21/2018: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Sale

10/10/2018: Notice of Sale

Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 10/10/18 at 9:00AM

7/11/2018: Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 10/10/18 at 9:00AM

Default

6/19/2018: Default

Proof of Publication/Notice of Action 5/3/18; 5/10/18

5/14/2018: Proof of Publication/Notice of Action 5/3/18; 5/10/18

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Parties in Possession #2

3/28/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Parties in Possession #2

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Spouse of Ross C. Lansing

3/28/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Spouse of Ross C. Lansing

Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

3/27/2018: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

Certificate of Title

12/10/2018: Certificate of Title

Certificate Of No Disbursement

12/10/2018: Certificate Of No Disbursement

Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 10/18/18; 10/25/18

10/26/2018: Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 10/18/18; 10/25/18

Notice of Service Plaintiff's

7/11/2018: Notice of Service Plaintiff's

Notice of Dropping Party

6/19/2018: Notice of Dropping Party

Motion for Default/Default

6/19/2018: Motion for Default/Default

Default proposed

6/19/2018: Default proposed

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Parties in Possession #1

3/28/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Parties in Possession #1

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Ross C. Lansing

3/28/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Ross C. Lansing

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Put Plaintiff in possession on 1.10.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Granting Motion for Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion For Writ Of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Civil-Reopen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Title

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate Of No Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Certification of Possession of Original Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST MORTGAGE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHMAN, BARRY STUART