This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 10/13/2020 at 16:01:54 (UTC).

SUNPORT FINANCIAL LLC vs. RICE, DEBRA

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 SUNPORT FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICE, DEBRA. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1643

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNPORT FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

RICE, DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPIRES, ESQ., WINTER E

 

Court Documents

REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SIGNED

9/21/2020: REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SIGNED

PAYMENT $357.95 RECEIPT #51762

9/15/2020: PAYMENT $357.95 RECEIPT #51762

REGISTERED MAIL SENT

9/15/2020: REGISTERED MAIL SENT

CLERK'S COVER LETTER TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

9/15/2020: CLERK'S COVER LETTER TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF RECORDING

9/15/2020: NOTICE OF RECORDING

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REGISTERED MAIL RETURNED SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $357.95 RECEIPT #51762

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REGISTERED MAIL SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S COVER LETTER TO PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/15/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020SC001643

    Read MoreRead Less