This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 04/10/2021 at 00:21:07 (UTC).

SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, INC vs. ALTON HOWARD AKA ALTON RAY HOWARD

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALTON HOWARD AKA ALTON RAY HOWARD. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0116

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY, INC

Defendants

MARGARITA HOWARD AKA MARGARITA LINDSAY HOWARD

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

ALTON HOWARD AKA ALTON RAY HOWARD

RIDEOUT HIDEAWAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSER, EVAN

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

3/10/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

3/10/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

2/25/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

2/25/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

2/25/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1

2/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED ON RIDEOUT HIDEAWAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

2/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ON RIDEOUT HIDEAWAY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/19/2020 9:09 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020008947

2/14/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/19/2020 9:09 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020008947

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/14/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

2/25/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

2/25/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

COMPLAINT

2/14/2020: COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF NOTE

2/14/2020: CERTIFICATE OF NOTE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

2/14/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

PAYMENT $955.00 RECEIPT #24014

2/19/2020: PAYMENT $955.00 RECEIPT #24014

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/14/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

2/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

2/14/2020: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $955.00 RECEIPT #24014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/19/2020 9:09 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020008947

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: REAL PROPERTY MTG CLAIM MORE THAN 50,000 LESS THAN 250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000116

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN WEST MORTGAGE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Glasser