This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/13/2020 at 08:53:58 (UTC).

Sara Woofter vs Ruth Hammett

Case Summary

On 01/18/2018 Sara Woofter filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ruth Hammett. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0048

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOOFTER, SARA M

Defendants

PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COMPANY

HAMMETT, RUTH W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROTSTEIN, JONATHAN

UNDERHILL, W ASHBY

Defendant Attorneys

SCOTT, LORI C

AMSDELL, KELSEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement to Defendant

3/14/2019: Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement to Defendant

Notice of Appearance

9/11/2018: Notice of Appearance

Motion to appear Telephonically

9/11/2018: Motion to appear Telephonically

Motion to appear Telephonically

8/1/2018: Motion to appear Telephonically

Notice of Service

5/16/2018: Notice of Service

Notice of Appearance

5/9/2018: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service Defendnat's NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, SARA M. WOOFTER S, INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

4/25/2018: Notice of Service Defendnat's NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, SARA M. WOOFTER S, INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Service of Interrogatories to Progressive

3/21/2018: Notice of Service of Interrogatories to Progressive

Alias Summons Issued as to: Ruth Hammett

3/15/2018: Alias Summons Issued as to: Ruth Hammett

Notice of Appearance

3/7/2018: Notice of Appearance

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Ruth W. Hammett

1/23/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Ruth W. Hammett

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Progressive Direct Insurance Company

1/23/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Progressive Direct Insurance Company

Civil Cover Sheet

1/18/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketEntry: Final Order of Dismissal as to Progressive Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Non-Objection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Taking Deposition of Sara Woofter on 3/15/2019 at 10:00am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice/Production from nonparty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: Stipulation for Dismissal without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) on Motion to Attend the Hearing Scheduled for Setptember 24, 2018 Via Telephone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Non-Served as to Ruth W. Hammett on 3/5/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Ruth W. Hammett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Progressive Direct Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Direct Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Lori Cooper