This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/14/2020 at 14:57:21 (UTC).

saint william land co inc vs libby withrow

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 saint william land co inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against libby withrow. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. and FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1016

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAINT WILLIAM LAND CO INC

Defendant

WITHROW, LIBBY GAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON, WILLIAM K

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

2/12/2020: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

2/11/2020: RETURNED MAIL

WRIT OF POSSESSION

1/16/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

1/15/2020: PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

1/6/2020: MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

12/23/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

12/23/2019: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #15436

12/20/2019: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #15436

PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE

10/25/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE

SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/14/2019 9:20 AM / RECEPTION #: 2019054762

10/18/2019: SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/14/2019 9:20 AM / RECEPTION #: 2019054762

NOTICE OF SALE

10/14/2019: NOTICE OF SALE

SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

10/14/2019: SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

PROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE

10/11/2019: PROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE

Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

8/22/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Libby Gail Withrow

9/26/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Libby Gail Withrow

Complaint

9/25/2018: Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

9/25/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit as to Amounts Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service SERVED SUMMONS TO LIBBY WITHROW ON 10.8.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Libby Gail Withrow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Attachment of Exhibit to Pleading

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less