This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 11:48:47 (UTC).

Ronald Lapointe vs. Christopher Brown

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 Ronald Lapointe filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Christopher Brown. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. and MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1823

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAPOINTE, RITA

LAPOINTE, RONALD

Defendants

BROWN, REBEKA

BROWN, CHRISTOPHER THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Three Day Notice to Pay/Vacate

8/27/2018: Three Day Notice to Pay/Vacate

Eviction Summons Issued as to Christopher Brown

8/27/2018: Eviction Summons Issued as to Christopher Brown

Eviction Summons Issued as to Rebeka Brown

8/27/2018: Eviction Summons Issued as to Rebeka Brown

Count II Sum/NTA Executed as to Christopher Brown; SubServed; 8/30/18

9/4/2018: Count II Sum/NTA Executed as to Christopher Brown; SubServed; 8/30/18

Count II Sum/NTA Executed as to Rebeka Brown; Individually Served on 8/30/18

9/4/2018: Count II Sum/NTA Executed as to Rebeka Brown; Individually Served on 8/30/18

Writ of Possession Sent to CCSO w/ $90

9/10/2018: Writ of Possession Sent to CCSO w/ $90

Docket Sheet do FJ

10/11/2018: Docket Sheet do FJ

Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

9/7/2018: Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

Receipt Court Costs

8/27/2018: Receipt Court Costs

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet do FJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: 10/10/2018 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service executed Writ of Possession to Ronald Lapointe on 9/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: 09/10/2018 Final Judgment of Eviction Count I Only, Final Judgment of Eviction Count I Only (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Possession Sent to CCSO w/ $90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed Posted as to Rebeka Brown 8/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed Posted as to Christopher Brown on 8/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Count II Sum/NTA Executed as to Christopher Brown; SubServed; 8/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Lease/Rental Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued as to Rebeka Brown 10/9/18 @ 1:00pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued as to Christopher Brown 10/9/18 @ 1:00pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as to Rebeka Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as to Christopher Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Receipt Court Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Three Day Notice to Pay/Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Plaintiff's Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less