This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/13/2020 at 11:04:07 (UTC).

Robert Kaplafka vs Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 Robert Kaplafka filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0124

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAPLAFKA, ROBERT JOHN

KESSINGER, DESIREE L

Defendant

TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREDERICK, FORREST TODD

Defendant Attorneys

SLADE, KATHRYN

PACKER, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

10/2/2018: Voluntary Dismissal

Disposition of mediation conference

8/7/2018: Disposition of mediation conference

Notice of Appearance

5/15/2018: Notice of Appearance

Clerks Cover Letter Transfer letter from Duval

2/6/2018: Clerks Cover Letter Transfer letter from Duval

20 Day Summons Issued as to Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company

2/6/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company

Civil Cover Sheet

2/6/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Disposition of mediation conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Designation of Primary E-Mail Address Defendant's Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice Of Mediation Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Answering Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Response to Request to Produce Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice DEFENDANT TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Taking Deposition M. VAN THOMAS ON AUGUST 16, 2018 AT 3 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Taking Deposition AUGUST 16, 2018; ROBERT KAPLAFKA AT 1 PM AND DESIREE KESSINGER AT 2 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Transferring

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Letter to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Production/To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Serving Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Designation of Primary E-Mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Civil Remedy Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to Tower Hill Signature Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill SIgnature Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREDERICK, FORREST TODD