This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/14/2020 at 02:08:59 (UTC).

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC vs JON MCGLONE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JON MCGLONE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. and FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0538

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

FORECLOSURE, JUDICIAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETA

CITIBANK NA

MCGLONE, JON B

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JON B MCGLONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

GUZMAN, LUIS R ESQ

DAVIE, WILLIAM H. II; ESQ

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Disbursement

5/3/2019: Certificate of Disbursement

Certificate of Title

5/2/2019: Certificate of Title

Notice of Appearance JON MCGLONE

4/15/2019: Notice of Appearance JON MCGLONE

Notice of Unavailability

3/6/2019: Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Appearance Jon McGlone

2/5/2019: Notice of Appearance Jon McGlone

Certificate of Disbursement Proposed

1/23/2019: Certificate of Disbursement Proposed

Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 12/13/18; 12/20/18

12/28/2018: Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 12/13/18; 12/20/18

Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 10.17.18 at 9 am

8/22/2018: Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 10.17.18 at 9 am

Default State of Florida Department of Revenue

8/21/2018: Default State of Florida Department of Revenue

Motion for Default/Default STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

8/20/2018: Motion for Default/Default STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Default Entered Against Jon B McGlone and Citibank N.A.

7/30/2018: Default Entered Against Jon B McGlone and Citibank N.A.

Motion for Default/Default with proposed default

7/30/2018: Motion for Default/Default with proposed default

20 Day Summons Issued as to:State of Florida, Department of Revenue

6/5/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:State of Florida, Department of Revenue

20 Day Summons Issued as to:United States of America, on Behalf of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development

6/5/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:United States of America, on Behalf of the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Citibank, N.A.

6/5/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Citibank, N.A.

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Jon B. McGlone

6/5/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Jon B. McGlone

Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

6/4/2018: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

6/4/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEntry: Check Released From Registry doc stamps

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEntry: Check Request to Administration doc stamps

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: Check Released From Registry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: Check Request to Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service Certificate of Title and Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Title

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) on Pending Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: Exhibits Filed into Evidence 3rd party's #1; filed 4.29.19; certificate of sale

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant