Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 04/11/2021 at 19:20:55 (UTC).

RAULERSON, BRETT ALLEN vs. ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 RAULERSON, BRETT ALLEN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0598

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAULERSON, JOYCE

RAULERSON, BRETT ALLEN

Defendants

ROTHSCHILD, M.D., CHESLOVAS

BURGESS, LYZA

KHARRAZI, ANGELIKA L

KOUTZ, DAVID ANTHONY

HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS, LLC

PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES LLC

WINNINGHAM, DAVID

TEAM HEALTH, LLC

ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC

INPATIENT CONSULTANTS OF FLORIDA, INC.

INPHYNET CONTRACTING SERVICES, LLC

CARSON-HILL, VILMA SOPHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOWELL, MATTHEW WILLIS

Defendant Attorneys

KNAPP, SCOTT

PENNY, E VICTORIA

WORLEY, JENIFER STRICKLAND

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S CHESLOVAS V. ROTHSCHILD, MD INTERROGATORIES

10/9/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S CHESLOVAS V. ROTHSCHILD, MD INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSEWRS TO DEFENDANT'S CHESLOVAS V ROTHSCHILD MD, MEDICARE/MEDICAID INTERROGATORIES

10/9/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSEWRS TO DEFENDANT'S CHESLOVAS V ROTHSCHILD MD, MEDICARE/MEDICAID INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID WINNINGHAM'S MEDICAL MALPRACTICE INTERROGATORIES

10/16/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID WINNINGHAM'S MEDICAL MALPRACTICE INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE UNVERIFED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID WINNINGHAM'S CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES

10/16/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE UNVERIFED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, DAVID WINNINGHAM'S CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES, LLC'S MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

10/16/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, PARAGON EMERGENCY SERVICES, LLC'S MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOYCE RAULERSON

9/18/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOYCE RAULERSON

NOTICE OF SERVING CONSORTIUM INTERROGAOTRIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOYCE RAULERSON

8/31/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING CONSORTIUM INTERROGAOTRIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOYCE RAULERSON

PAYMENT $110.00 RECEIPT #48372

8/20/2020: PAYMENT $110.00 RECEIPT #48372

COMPLAINT

8/3/2020: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND INTERROGATORIES

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICAL MALPRACTICE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, BRETT RAULERSON

9/18/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICAL MALPRACTICE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, BRETT RAULERSON

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

9/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

9/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/11/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/31/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/31/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICARE INTERROGAOTRIES TO PLAINTIFF, BRETT RAULERSON

8/31/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICARE INTERROGAOTRIES TO PLAINTIFF, BRETT RAULERSON

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, BRETT RAULERSON

8/31/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, BRETT RAULERSON

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 4.13.21 AT 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS DAVID A KOUTZ AND INPHYNET CONTRACTING SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO DAVID KOUTZ ARNP'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO ANGELIKA KHARRAZI AND INPATIENT CONSULTANTS OF FLORIDA, INC'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIM AFFILIATION AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
210 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO HEALTH TRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO VILMA SOPHIA CARSON-HILL, D.O.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LYZA J. BURGESS, APRN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: Motion Hearing; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Online

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING- 8.19.20 AT 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CONTINGENCY FEE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #45919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000598

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where ROTHSCHILD, M.D., CHESLOVAS is a litigant

Latest cases where Team Health is a litigant

Latest cases where Orange Park Medical Center, Inc. Dba Orange Park Medical Center is a litigant