This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 11:28:31 (UTC).

Progressive Select Insurance vs John Williams

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 Progressive Select Insurance filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against John Williams. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1807

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE

Defendant

WILLIAMS, JOHN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON, STEVEN J

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO AGREEMENT

9/25/2020: DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - NO AGREEMENT

MOTION TO RESET PRE-TRIAL HEARING

6/17/2020: MOTION TO RESET PRE-TRIAL HEARING

Alias Summons Issued NTA for Pretrial on 2/6/2018 at 1pm; issued from efile

12/4/2017: Alias Summons Issued NTA for Pretrial on 2/6/2018 at 1pm; issued from efile

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Stay Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet defendant in military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous Request and Authorization for Active Duty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous Request and Authorization for Active Duty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous Request and Authorization for Active Duty Training

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to John Williams; Individually Served on 12/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Alias Summons Issued NTA for Pretrial on 2/6/2018 at 1pm; issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: Unexecuted Summons Returned Non-Served Summons to John Williams on 10.28.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial on 12/5/17 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued Pretrial: Sent to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacobson, Steven J, ESQ.