This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 21:29:11 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs DESEAN FORD

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DESEAN FORD. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0841

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

FORD, DESEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN, JOSEPH F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO ROSEN, JOSEPH F REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2018SC000841, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS DESEAN FORD WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS FREETYPE-12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER PRE-TRIAL 120 DAYS TO PROVE SERVICE OR DISMISS WITHOUT FURTHER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.; Location: Courtroom 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #7887

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Extension of Time TO SERVE PROCESS ON THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet No Return of Service on File PRIOR to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued 6/5/18 @ 1:00pm - issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Designation of Primary E-Mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN , JOSEPH F