This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 21:05:43 (UTC).

Penny Blackmon vs. Johnathan McConnell

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Penny Blackmon filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Johnathan McConnell. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2402

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLACKMON, PENNY

Defendants

MCCONNELL, JOHNATHAN

TENANTS, UNKNOWN

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Trial w/o Jury Hearing set for 12/12/18 at 10:00am..IF Defendant(s) Deposit $ 850 in Rent Monies into Clerk's Registry by Noon on 12/11/18

11/20/2018: Order Setting Trial w/o Jury Hearing set for 12/12/18 at 10:00am..IF Defendant(s) Deposit $ 850 in Rent Monies into Clerk's Registry by Noon on 12/11/18

Receipt Court Costs

11/9/2018: Receipt Court Costs

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service executed Writ of Possession to Penny Blackmon 12/14/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: 12/13/2018 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Possession to CCSO w/$90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Denying Motion to Deposit Rent Late

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for court to allow late rent deposit - emailed to JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Order Setting Trial w/o Jury Hearing set for 12/12/18 at 10:00am..IF Defendant(s) Deposit $ 850 in Rent Monies into Clerk's Registry by Noon on 12/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Answer emailed to JA for Judge's review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed Individually Served 11/9/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed individually served Johnthan McConnell 11/9/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as to Unknown Tenants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as to Johnathan McConnell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Receipt Court Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Lease/Rental Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Three Day Notice to Pay/Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Plaintiff's Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less