This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 07:05:51 (UTC).

PACIFICA LOAN THREE LLC AS MANAGER FOR BLUFF HOUSE vs. VANEQUE UDELL

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 PACIFICA LOAN THREE LLC AS MANAGER FOR BLUFF HOUSE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VANEQUE UDELL. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1577

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFICA LOAN THREE LLC AS MANAGER FOR BLUFF HOUSE

Defendant

UDELL, VANEQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING, SR., DALE G ESQ

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for 10/2/17 at 9:00 am..w/ Special Condition that Defendant Deposit $ 1,740 in Rent Monies into Clerk's Registry by Noon on 9/29/17

9/22/2017: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for 10/2/17 at 9:00 am..w/ Special Condition that Defendant Deposit $ 1,740 in Rent Monies into Clerk's Registry by Noon on 9/29/17

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Returned Mail as to Vanaque Udell; Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Returned Mail as to Vaneque Udell; Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: 10/19/2017 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Granting Re-Open

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: Reopen by Other Means

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Re-Open Case (by Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for 10/2/17 at 9:00 am..w/ Special Condition that Defendant Deposit $ 1,740 in Rent Monies into Clerk's Registry by Noon on 9/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: Answer emailed to JA for Judge's review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed Posted as to Vaneque Udell on 9.15.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint with Lease and 3 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less