This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 15:28:55 (UTC).

PACIFICA LOAN THREE FOR BLUFF HOUSE vs. BRITTANY JONES

Case Summary

On 11/21/2017 PACIFICA LOAN THREE FOR BLUFF HOUSE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRITTANY JONES. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2020

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFICA LOAN THREE FOR BLUFF HOUSE

Defendant

JONES, BRITTANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING, SR., DALE G ESQ

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 12.18.17 at 10 am IF defendant deposits $2,180.00 in registry by NOON 12.15.17

12/11/2017: Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 12.18.17 at 10 am IF defendant deposits $2,180.00 in registry by NOON 12.15.17

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Writ of Possession; Executed on 12/29/17; Plaintiff's Agent took possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Possession Sent to CCSO w/ $90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: 12/18/2017 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 12.18.17 at 10 am IF defendant deposits $2,180.00 in registry by NOON 12.15.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service E-service of Answer to Attorney of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: Answer emailed to JA for Judge's review on 12/8/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous see notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed as to Brittany Jones; Posted on 11/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint with Lease and 3 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less