This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 20:33:41 (UTC).

PACIFICA LOAN THREE FOR BLUFF HOUSE APTS vs. BRYANT PATTERSON

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 PACIFICA LOAN THREE FOR BLUFF HOUSE APTS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRYANT PATTERSON. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0766

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFICA LOAN THREE FOR BLUFF HOUSE APTS

Defendant

PATTERSON, BRYANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING, SR., DALE G ESQ

 

Court Documents

Default

5/7/2018: Default

Default Proposed

5/5/2018: Default Proposed

Motion for Default Default Judgment and Non-Military Affidavit

5/5/2018: Motion for Default Default Judgment and Non-Military Affidavit

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service executed Writ of Possession to Trisha Sweat as agent 6/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Possession issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Writ Proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: 05/09/2018 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default Proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default Default Judgment and Non-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed posted as to Bryant Patterson on 4/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint with 3 Day Notice & Lease attached - Possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less