This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 04/10/2021 at 19:14:38 (UTC).

OVERWATCH PARTNERS, INC. vs. DOE, JOHN

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 OVERWATCH PARTNERS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against DOE, JOHN. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0596

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OVERWATCH PARTNERS, INC.

Defendants

GODADDY.COM, LLC

DOMAINS BY PROXY, LLC

DOE, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS, CARL G

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

11/18/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

10/19/2020: NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTONREY

11/9/2020: CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTONREY

PAYMENT $2.00 RECEIPT #50231

9/3/2020: PAYMENT $2.00 RECEIPT #50231

DEFENDANTS GODADDY.COM, LLC AND DOMAINS BY PROXY, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS

8/26/2020: DEFENDANTS GODADDY.COM, LLC AND DOMAINS BY PROXY, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS

PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #47863

8/17/2020: PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #47863

AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

8/13/2020: AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING 8/12/2020 AT 1:30PM

8/9/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING 8/12/2020 AT 1:30PM

NOTICE OF HEARING 8/12/2020 AT 1:30PM

8/9/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING 8/12/2020 AT 1:30PM

PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #59579

11/9/2020: PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #59579

NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

11/12/2020: NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/21/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

8/18/2020: NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

8/12/2020: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

8/11/2020: MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM

8/11/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CORP SERVED AS TO DOMANS BY PROXY, LLC ON 8.6.20

8/6/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CORP SERVED AS TO DOMANS BY PROXY, LLC ON 8.6.20

MOTION

8/3/2020: MOTION

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FROM FIRST DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #79061

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FROM FIRST DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FROM FIRST DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 3/5/2021 1:24 PM / RECEPTION #: 2021013776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/12/2021 8:31 AM / RECEPTION #: 2021009049

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: Motion Hearing; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Online

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CORP SERVED AS TO GODADDY.COM, LLC ON 8.6.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- CORP SERVED AS TO DOMANS BY PROXY, LLC ON 8.6.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #46116

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK AS TO GODADDY.COM, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK AS TO DOMAINS BY PROXY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #45879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000596

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Domains by Proxy Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Godaddy, Inc is a litigant