This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 04:40:09 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC fka SPRINGLEAF vs. BOBBY JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC fka SPRINGLEAF filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOBBY JOHNSON. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1038

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC FKA SPRINGLEAF

Defendants

JOHNSON, SARAH E

JOHNSON, BOBBY L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBELLO, THOMAS III

 

Court Documents

Alias Summons Issued AS TO BOBBY JOHNSON 10/15/19 @ 1:00PM

9/10/2019: Alias Summons Issued AS TO BOBBY JOHNSON 10/15/19 @ 1:00PM

Alias Summons Issued SNTA ON 10.15.19 AT 1 PM

9/10/2019: Alias Summons Issued SNTA ON 10.15.19 AT 1 PM

Civil Cover Sheet

6/15/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 11/5/2019 12:20 PM / RECEPTION #: 2019059212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: UNEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED AS TO SARAH JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - INDIVIDUALLY SERVED 9/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Alias Summons Issued AS TO BOBBY JOHNSON 10/15/19 @ 1:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Alias Summons Issued SNTA ON 10.15.19 AT 1 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: Unexecuted Summons Returned Notice to Appear non-served Bobby Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet no return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial: 7/11/17 at 1pm; as to Sarah Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial: 7/11/17 at 1pm; as to Bobby Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less