This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 11:11:30 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA, INC. f/k/a SPRINGLE vs.HELEN NEAL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA, INC f/k/a SPRINGLE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HELEN NEAL. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0437

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA, INC. F/K/A SPRINGLE

Defendant

NEAL, HELEN M

Garnishees

VYSTAR CREDIT UNION

RACETRAC PETROLEUM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBELLO, THOMAS III

 

Court Documents

Motion to appear Telephonically on March 8, 2018 at 10:30 a.m.

3/5/2018: Motion to appear Telephonically on March 8, 2018 at 10:30 a.m.

Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing Re-Set to March 8, 2018 at 10:30am

3/1/2018: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing Re-Set to March 8, 2018 at 10:30am

Certificate of Service

2/28/2018: Certificate of Service

Order Setting Trial/Hearing 3.8.18 at 9:45 am

2/28/2018: Order Setting Trial/Hearing 3.8.18 at 9:45 am

Certificate of Service

2/27/2018: Certificate of Service

Default

11/13/2017: Default

Default Proposed

11/10/2017: Default Proposed

Motion for Default No Proposed Default Attached

11/10/2017: Motion for Default No Proposed Default Attached

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

7/20/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

Civil Cover Sheet

7/19/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice OF PLAINTIFF REMITTING FUNDS TO GARNISHEE S ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Answer Of Garnishee Racetrac

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Granting Defendant Head of Family

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Allowing Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion to appear Telephonically on March 8, 2018 at 10:30 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Racetrac Petroleum; Corporate Served on 2/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing Re-Set to March 8, 2018 at 10:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Order Setting Trial/Hearing 3.8.18 at 9:45 am

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit in Support of Motion for Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default Proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default No Proposed Default Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Final Judgment after Default, Award of Attorney's Fees and Order Directing Defendant to Complete the Fact Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: Executed Summons Returned Sub Served Summons to Christina Neal for Helen Neal on 7.28.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RACETRAC PETROLEUM INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VYSTAR CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC AST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lobello, Thomas, III