This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/02/2023 at 16:04:54 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs. RENNARD, SARA ANNE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RENNARD, SARA ANNE. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

RENNARD, SARA ANNE

PALMERI, ANNELIESE

PALMERI, ROBERT L

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION I

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SARA RENNARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/5/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/9/2023 9:19 AM / RECEPTION #: 2023000970

1/5/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/9/2023 9:19 AM / RECEPTION #: 2023000970

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

1/5/2023: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED ON SARA RENNARD

1/5/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED ON SARA RENNARD

SUMMONS ISSUED ON ANNELIESE PALMERI

1/5/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED ON ANNELIESE PALMERI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON ROBERT PALMERI

1/5/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED ON ROBERT PALMERI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1

1/5/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

1/5/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE

1/5/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

1/5/2023: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

PAYMENT $980.00 RECEIPT #172680

1/6/2023: PAYMENT $980.00 RECEIPT #172680

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

1/6/2023: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- SUB SVD FOR SARA RENNARD ON 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- SUB SVD FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SARA RENNARD ON 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- NON SVD UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- NON SVD UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $980.00 RECEIPT #172680

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON ROBERT PALMERI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON ANNELIESE PALMERI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON SARA RENNARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/9/2023 9:19 AM / RECEPTION #: 2023000970

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/05/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA000008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less