This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/04/2020 at 09:00:43 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC vs. BRITTS JR, JAMES E

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BRITTS JR, JAMES E. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1335

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

BRITTS JR, JAMES E

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES E BRITTS JR

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF CLAY COUNTY FLORIDA

BRITTS, KANDI MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $965.00 RECEIPT #12801

12/3/2019: PAYMENT $965.00 RECEIPT #12801

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES #2

12/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES #2

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES #1

12/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES #1

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

12/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO KANDI BRITTS

12/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO KANDI BRITTS

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES BRITTS, JR.

12/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES BRITTS, JR.

SUMMONS ISSUED A TO JAMES BRITTS, JR.

12/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED A TO JAMES BRITTS, JR.

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/2/2019: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

12/2/2019: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/3/2019 11:56 AM / RECEPTION #: 2019064018

12/2/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/3/2019 11:56 AM / RECEPTION #: 2019064018

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/2/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $965.00 RECEIPT #12801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTIES #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO KANDI BRITTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES BRITTS, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED A TO JAMES BRITTS, JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketREAL PROPERTY MTG CLAIM MORE THAN 50,000 LESS THAN 250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001335

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clerk fo Circuit Court of Broward County is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHMAN, BARRY STUART