This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 04/08/2021 at 20:24:09 (UTC).

MT BANK vs. DAVILA JR, ANGEL J

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 MT BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DAVILA JR, ANGEL J. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0072

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MT BANK

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

DAVILA JR, ANGEL J

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

OAKLEAF PLANTATION WEST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

CARNEY, ROSARIO C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

5/26/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 5.26.20 AT 9:00 AM

5/22/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 5.26.20 AT 9:00 AM

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

2/14/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

PAYMENT $1,955.00 RECEIPT #22310

2/6/2020: PAYMENT $1,955.00 RECEIPT #22310

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANGEL DAVILA JR

2/5/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ANGEL DAVILA JR

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROSARIO CARNEY

2/5/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROSARIO CARNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO OAKLEAF PLANTATION WEST

2/5/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO OAKLEAF PLANTATION WEST

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #1

2/5/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #2

2/5/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #2

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

2/5/2020: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

2/5/2020: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/6/2020 3:33 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020006796

2/5/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/6/2020 3:33 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020006796

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/5/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: Foreclosure; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Division A Chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • HearingEvent: Foreclosure; Judge: SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.; Location: Division A Chambers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 5.26.20 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED SUMMONS ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2 ON 02-20-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED SUMMONS ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 ON 02-20-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO STAY CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 2/6/2020 3:33 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020006796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: REAL PROPERTY MTG CLAIM $250,000 OR MORE ASSESSED $1905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/05/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000072

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MT BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where OAKLEAF PLANTATION WEST PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ