This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 16:15:44 (UTC).

Moore Chiropractic Center, Inc. vs United Services Automobile Association

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Moore Chiropractic Center, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against United Services Automobile Association. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2113

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC.

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINER, MELISSA (RAKIN) ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

HEILMAN, JOHN W ESQ

WILLIAMS, ROBERT E ESQ

 

Court Documents

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/2/2018: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Docket Sheet Call to Set

11/14/2018: Docket Sheet Call to Set

Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

12/3/2018: Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

4/15/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/18/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/27/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

8/12/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Notice of Appearance amended

10/30/2018: Notice of Appearance amended

Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

10/19/2018: Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: Request for Admissions TO DEFENDANT TO AUTHENTICATE PAYOUT LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Answer/Affirmative Defenses Plaintiff's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Answer/Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Production/To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Designation of Primary E-Mail Address as to Plaintiff's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet Call to Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Notice of Return; CFO served 10/5/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued 11/13/18 @ 1:00pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOORE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC. A/A/O DELMA ALVAREZ is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT ELY WILLIAMS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEILMAN JOHN W