This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 04:20:13 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs.EUNICE MCCARTY

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 Midland Funding LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against EUNICE MCCARTY. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0351

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MCCARTY, EUNICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA

 

Court Documents

Motion to Appoint Process Server

6/12/2017: Motion to Appoint Process Server

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

6/12/2017: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Order Appointing Process Server

6/23/2017: Order Appointing Process Server

Notice of Lack of Prosecution & Notice of Hearing December 17, 2018 at 9:00am

9/20/2018: Notice of Lack of Prosecution & Notice of Hearing December 17, 2018 at 9:00am

Notice of Dismissal

12/13/2018: Notice of Dismissal

Certificate of Service by email

7/27/2017: Certificate of Service by email

20 Day Summons Issued issued from file

6/13/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from file

Civil Cover Sheet

6/12/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Lack of Prosecution & Notice of Hearing December 17, 2018 at 9:00am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Service by email

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service summons sub srved David McCarty for Eunice McCarty 7/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA