This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 17:11:26 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. TEREASA PEACOCK

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 Midland Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TEREASA PEACOCK. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2107

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PEACOCK, TEREASA

Garnishee

JACKSONVILLE ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E ESQ

Defendant Attorney

HINES, AMBER JILL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

11/19/2018: Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

Order Setting Trial/Hearing on 11/15/18 at 9:00am

10/24/2018: Order Setting Trial/Hearing on 11/15/18 at 9:00am

Civil Cover Sheet

12/5/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Dissolving Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Suggestion of Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Granting Motion to Set Aside Order Denying Defendant's Claim of Exemption; HEARING SET FOR 12/12/18 at 10:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Set Aside Order Denying Defendant's Claim of Exemption, Entering Final Judgment of Garnishment, Directing Garnishee to Disburse Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Reopen by Other Means

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Denying Defendant's Claim of Exemption, Entering Final Judgment of Garnishment, Directing Garnishee to Disburse Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice to Defendant Second

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet Defendant Not Present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Executed Summons Returned Sub Served Summons to William Peacock for Tereasa Peacock on 12.30.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial on 02/06/2018 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less