This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 00:59:18 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs DAMARY REYES

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Midland Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAMARY REYES. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2719

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

REYES, DAMARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service

2/23/2019: Certificate of Service

Civil Cover Sheet

12/11/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: 01/22/2019 Order Approving Stip & Closing File, Order Approving Stip & Closing File (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet pending stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service NTA individually served 1/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued Pretrial on 1/15/2019 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less