This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 17:13:31 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs BRIAN VALLER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2017 Midland Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRIAN VALLER. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2110

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

VALLER, BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN, COLLEEN E ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion to appear Telephonically by the Records Custodian Witness

3/28/2018: Motion to appear Telephonically by the Records Custodian Witness

Civil Cover Sheet

12/6/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: 04/05/2018 Order Approving Stip & Closing File, Order Approving Stip & Closing File (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Granting Plaintiff's Motion Allowing Records Custodian Witness to Appear by Telephone at Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Witness/Expert Witness List and Witness List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Proof of Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit as to Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Docuemnts in Support of Entry of Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion to appear Telephonically by the Records Custodian Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet denies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order and Notice of Trial 4.3.18 at 10:30 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Summons/NTA individually served Brian Valler on 2/1/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial on 02/06/2018 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less