This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 19:28:39 (UTC).

Michelle Matthews vs. James Young

Case Summary

On 04/16/2018 Michelle Matthews filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against James Young. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0718

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEWS, MICHELLE

Defendant

YOUNG, JAMES

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

4/26/2018: Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

Receipt Court Costs

4/16/2018: Receipt Court Costs

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service executed Writ of Possession to Melissa Dennis as agent 4/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: 04/27/2018 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: Writ of Possession Sent to CCSO w/ $90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default/Default emailed to JA for Judge's review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed individually served 4/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued Amended to correct street name spelling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Receipt Court Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Authorization Letter/Management Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice to Quit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Plaintiff's Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less