This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 13:30:27 (UTC).

Michael Smiley,Kelley SmileyvsMelissa Cain

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 Michael Smiley,Kelley SmileyvsMelissa Cain was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0150

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMILEY, KELLEY

SMILEY, MICHAEL

Defendant

MAY, MELISSA CAIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUZMAN, LUIS R ESQ

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Attorney's Fees

8/24/2018: Affidavit of Attorney's Fees

Order Setting Trial/Hearing 5/21/18 @ 8:30am on Defendant's Motion to Stay Sale

5/18/2018: Order Setting Trial/Hearing 5/21/18 @ 8:30am on Defendant's Motion to Stay Sale

Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 4/10/18 @ 9:00am

4/6/2018: Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 4/10/18 @ 9:00am

Receipt Court Costs for Mediation fees / paid by Plaintiff for Plaintiff

3/27/2018: Receipt Court Costs for Mediation fees / paid by Plaintiff for Plaintiff

Order Refering Parties to Mediation

3/22/2018: Order Refering Parties to Mediation

Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 4/2/18 @ 1:30pm

3/22/2018: Order Setting Trial w/o Jury 4/2/18 @ 1:30pm

Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for March 22, 2018 at 11:30am; See order for more details

3/14/2018: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for March 22, 2018 at 11:30am; See order for more details

Receipt Court Costs

3/1/2018: Receipt Court Costs

Notice of Appearance and Designation of E-mail Address

3/1/2018: Notice of Appearance and Designation of E-mail Address

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: Returned Mail TO MELISSA CAIN - ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Recorded Awarding Attorneys Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Hearing 10/26/18 @ 10:30am on Motion for Attorney's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Attorney's Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Lift Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Objection of Sale - emailed to JA

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Melissa Cain; Individually Served on 3/5/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous 5 Day Summons - issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Receipt Court Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk Request form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance and Designation of E-mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less