This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 04/11/2021 at 19:18:02 (UTC).

LIBRETTO, MARISSA vs. SPRINGER, DANIEL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 LIBRETTO, MARISSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SPRINGER, DANIEL. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0595

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIBRETTO, MARISSA

Defendant

SPRINGER, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRELL, W. HOLT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLMENT

1/11/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

1/11/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL & PRETRIAL

10/21/2020: ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL & PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

10/12/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUMMONS AS TO DANIEL SPRINGER ON 8/28/2020

8/28/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUMMONS AS TO DANIEL SPRINGER ON 8/28/2020

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/3/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

8/3/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

8/11/2020: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

COMPLAINT

8/3/2020: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #45822

8/3/2020: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #45822

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK AS TO DANIEL JAMES SPRINGER

8/3/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK AS TO DANIEL JAMES SPRINGER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/3/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: Final Pre Trial Conference; Judge: LESTER, DON H.; Location: Chambers, Judge Lester

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 7.22.21 AT 9 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: OBJECTION TO THE USE OF THIRD PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF INTENT FROM NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING ON 1.25.21 AT 11 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE/PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT DANIEL SPRINGER'S VERIFIED INTERROGATORY ANSWERS

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUMMONS AS TO DANIEL SPRINGER ON 8/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #45822

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK AS TO DANIEL JAMES SPRINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000595

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRELL, W HOLT