This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 00:19:33 (UTC).

LANDMARK AMERICA FOR VISTA GRANDE vs. JOSHUA WRIGHT

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 LANDMARK AMERICA FOR VISTA GRANDE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSHUA WRIGHT. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1008

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDMARK AMERICA FOR VISTA GRANDE

Defendants

ELWELL, TERESA

WRIGHT, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLING, SR., DALE G ESQ

 

Court Documents

Default issued from efile

6/8/2018: Default issued from efile

Default Proposed

6/7/2018: Default Proposed

Motion for Default and Default Judgment and Non-Military Affidavit

6/7/2018: Motion for Default and Default Judgment and Non-Military Affidavit

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: 06/11/2018 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default Proposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default and Default Judgment and Non-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: Count I eviction executed Posted 5/29/18 as to Teresa Elwell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Teresa Elwell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Joshua Wright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint with Lease and 3 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less