This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 09:38:50 (UTC).

Lake Ridge Villas North at Fleming Island Plantati vs.Maya Myalil

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 Lake Ridge Villas North at Fleming Island Plantati filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Maya Myalil. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0409

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKE RIDGE VILLAS NORTH AT FLEMING ISLAND PLANTATI

Defendants

TENANT #1, UNKNOWN

TENANT #2, UNKNOWN

SABBAGH, EMAD WADIE

FLEMING ISLAND PLANTATION OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

MYALIL, MAYA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASANOVER, MICHAEL HENRY

Defendant Attorneys

PONTIERI, THERESA CARLI

HEEKIN, DAVID

CARLI, THERES M

 

Court Documents

Order of Substitution of Counsel

9/27/2017: Order of Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Substitution of Counsel

9/27/2017: Notice of Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendants; as to Maya Myalil and Tony Turner as Defendants

8/24/2017: Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendants; as to Maya Myalil and Tony Turner as Defendants

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile as to Unknown Tenant #2

7/5/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile as to Unknown Tenant #2

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile as to Fleming Island Plantation Owners

7/5/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile as to Fleming Island Plantation Owners

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile as to Maya Myalil

7/5/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile as to Maya Myalil

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Emad Sabbagh

7/5/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Emad Sabbagh

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Unknown Tenant #1

7/5/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Unknown Tenant #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7/5/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Voluntary Dismissal/Discharge of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Agreed; on Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint - Granted - 20 Days from Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Order of Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Substitution of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: Miscellaneous as to Unknown Tenant #2; NonServed; 8/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Emad Sabbagh; SubServed on Christina Myalil; 8/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Unknown Tenants; Indiivdually Served upon Unknown Tenant N/K/A Anthony Turner; 8/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Fleming Island Plantation Owners Association; Corporate Served; 7/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service as to Maya Myalil; SubServed on Christina Myalil; 8/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile; as to Unknown Tenant #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less