This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 09/06/2021 at 17:01:50 (UTC).

KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. INTEGRITAL EDGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INTEGRITAL EDGE, INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0595

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

INTEGRITAL EDGE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDONOUGH, SEAN M.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/6/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO INTEGRITAL EDGE, INC

7/6/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO INTEGRITAL EDGE, INC

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #97028

7/8/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #97028

COMPLAINT

7/6/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/10/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT NOT ENTERED-NO RETURN OF SERVICE

8/10/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT NOT ENTERED-NO RETURN OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

8/17/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED SUMMONS ON INTEGRITAL EDGE, INC ON 07-20-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT NOT ENTERED-NO RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #97028

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/08/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000595

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO INTEGRITAL EDGE, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDONOUGH , SEAN MICHAEL