This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/13/2020 at 10:51:43 (UTC).

Karen Damm vs Richard Temple

Case Summary

On 02/05/2018 Karen Damm filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Richard Temple. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COX, ANGELA M. and LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0119

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COX, ANGELA M.

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELL, DAVID DUANE

DAMM, KAREN

Defendants

TEMPLE, RICHARD PHILLIP

MADAY NURSERY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT, ANDREW DOUGLAS JR

STACKHOUSE, M. BRADFORD

Defendant Attorney

FULLER, SUSAN R ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING- 11.18.19 AT 10:40 AM

10/15/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING- 11.18.19 AT 10:40 AM

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION (PLAINTIFF)

10/11/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION (PLAINTIFF)

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR DISCOVERY AND TRIAL

10/9/2019: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR DISCOVERY AND TRIAL

Notice of Unavailability

9/5/2019: Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Appearance for the Plaintiff

6/3/2019: Notice of Appearance for the Plaintiff

Order Appointing Mediator

2/13/2019: Order Appointing Mediator

Notice of Unavailability

12/7/2018: Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

9/27/2018: Notice of Unavailability

Motion to appear Telephonically

9/14/2018: Motion to appear Telephonically

Notice of Service of Plaintiff, Karen Damms' Proposal for Settleemnt to Defendant, Richard Phillip Temple

8/3/2018: Notice of Service of Plaintiff, Karen Damms' Proposal for Settleemnt to Defendant, Richard Phillip Temple

Notice of Service

5/4/2018: Notice of Service

Notice of Service

4/19/2018: Notice of Service

Notice of Service

4/19/2018: Notice of Service

Notice of Service of Privilege Log

4/18/2018: Notice of Service of Privilege Log

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Maday Nursery, Inc.

2/6/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Maday Nursery, Inc.

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Richard Temple

2/6/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Richard Temple

Complaint

2/5/2018: Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

2/5/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • HearingEvent: Hearing; Judge: COX, ANGELA M.; Location: Chambers, Judge Cox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON DEFENDANTS OPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR DISCOVERY AND TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR DISCOVERY AND TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING- 11.18.19 AT 10:40 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT'S CONSENTS TO CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION (PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE AMENDED REQUEST FOR COMPLUSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FOR DISCOVERY AND TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Richard Temple

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Serving Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Serving Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Production/To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Production/To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less