This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/14/2020 at 03:41:25 (UTC).

JRE INVESTMENTS, INC vs Tammy Davis

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 JRE INVESTMENTS, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Tammy Davis. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0611

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JRE INVESTMENTS, INC

Defendants

SCOTT, TERRELL O

CAPITAL CITY BANK

O'QUINN, CLYDE I

DAVIS, TAMMY ANN

CLAY COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PONTIERI, THERESA CARLI

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

10/29/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

Motion for Default/Default

10/10/2018: Motion for Default/Default

Default

10/9/2018: Default

Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 9/6/18; 9/13/18; 9/20/18; 9/27/18

9/28/2018: Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 9/6/18; 9/13/18; 9/20/18; 9/27/18

Default

8/30/2018: Default

Default

8/28/2018: Default

20 Day Summons Issued Amended as to: Terrell O. Scott

7/25/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued Amended as to: Terrell O. Scott

20 Day Summons Issued Amended as to: Tammy Ann Davis

7/25/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued Amended as to: Tammy Ann Davis

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Terrell O. Scott

6/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Terrell O. Scott

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Clyde I O'Quinn

6/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Clyde I O'Quinn

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Tammy Ann Davis

6/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Tammy Ann Davis

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Capital City Bank c/o Davis Kimbrough

6/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Capital City Bank c/o Davis Kimbrough

20 Day Summons Issued as to: Tara S. Green

6/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Tara S. Green

Civil Cover Sheet

6/18/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: 01/30/2019 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: SKINNER, JOHN H)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Hearing 1/30/19 at 9:00 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Default/Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 9/6/18; 9/13/18; 9/20/18; 9/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Mailing/Service Notice of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Action Issued as to: Tammy Ann Davis and Terrell O Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to: Tara S. Green

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint to Quiet Title

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL CITY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pontieri, Theresa Carli