This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/25/2020 at 17:08:32 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. MELVIN, AMOS LEON

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MELVIN, AMOS LEON. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1435

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMOS L MELVIN

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

THE POINT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MELVIN, AMOS LEON

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

1/27/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

PAYMENT $955.00 RECEIPT #16934

1/3/2020: PAYMENT $955.00 RECEIPT #16934

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AMOS L. MELVIN

12/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AMOS L. MELVIN

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMOS L. MELVIN

12/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMOS L. MELVIN

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO THE POINT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

12/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO THE POINT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSESSION #1

12/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSESSION #1

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

12/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

12/27/2019: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; CORP SERVED SUMMONS TO P. TIHLARIK FOR THE POINT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION ON 2.3.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; FILED BY THE POINT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $955.00 RECEIPT #16934

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AMOS L. MELVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMOS L. MELVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO THE POINT PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSESSION #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: REAL PROPERTY MTG CLAIM MORE THAN 50,000 LESS THAN 250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/27/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001435

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ