This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 17:10:56 (UTC).

JNS Physicians Group, LLC. d/b/a Spinal Injury Cen vs Direct General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 JNS Physicians Group, LLC d/b/a Spinal Injury Cen filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Direct General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2163

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JNS PHYSICIANS GROUP, LLC. D/B/A SPINAL INJURY CEN

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINER, MELISSA (RAKIN) ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

AUSTIN, SHANNA L

BLUME, WILLIAM MCFARLAND III

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

1/24/2019: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Addresses; as to Counsel for Defendant

11/5/2018: Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Addresses; as to Counsel for Defendant

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: Response Defendant's Privilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: Answer/Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Production/To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Designation of Primary E-Mail Address as to Plaintiff's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet Civil Rules Invoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Notice of Return; CFO Served 10/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance and Designation of Email Addresses; as to Counsel for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued Pretrial on 11/13/18 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less