This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 01:19:33 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs.DONNETTE WARD

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DONNETTE WARD. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0293

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

WARD, DONNETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

5/15/2017: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Motion to Appoint Process Server

5/15/2017: Motion to Appoint Process Server

Order Appointing Process Server

5/23/2017: Order Appointing Process Server

Motion to appear Telephonically file by Plaintiff

7/27/2017: Motion to appear Telephonically file by Plaintiff

Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for August 30, 2017 at 3:00pm

7/19/2017: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for August 30, 2017 at 3:00pm

20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

5/16/2017: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

Civil Cover Sheet

5/15/2017: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: 09/18/2017 Order Approving Stip & Closing File, Order Approving Stip & Closing File (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) On Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Motion to appear Telephonically file by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order (Generic) on Motion to Appear by phone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for August 30, 2017 at 3:00pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Final Judgment on the Pleadings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: Answer emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Summons SUBSTITUTE SERVICE on Paul Billings for DONNETTE WARD on 24th day of May, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C