This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 07:37:08 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs. CANNON, JAMES

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CANNON, JAMES. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1283

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendants

CLARK, JAMMIE

CANNON, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

1/31/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER BY DEFENDANT JAMES CANNON

1/15/2020: ANSWER BY DEFENDANT JAMES CANNON

EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED INDV SRVD 12/21/19

1/6/2020: EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED INDV SRVD 12/21/19

EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - INDV SRVD 12/23/19

12/23/2019: EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - INDV SRVD 12/23/19

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #11322

11/21/2019: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #11322

COMPLAINT

11/20/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/20/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL

11/20/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMMIE CLARK

11/20/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMMIE CLARK

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMES CANNON

11/20/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMES CANNON

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CC001283, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS. CANNON, JAMES WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS MOT-1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CC001283, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS. CANNON, JAMES WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS ANS-1/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AS TO JAMMIE CLARK ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFENDANT JAMES CANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED INDV SRVD 12/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED - INDV SRVD 12/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #11322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMMIE CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMES CANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY CIVIL CLAIMS > $2,500 <= $15,000 ASSESSED $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/20/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CC001283

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C