This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/29/2020 at 17:02:46 (UTC).

INGRAM, ANGELIA M vs. ELLIOTT, FRED SCOTT

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 INGRAM, ANGELIA M filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELLIOTT, FRED SCOTT. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LESTER, DON H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1447

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LESTER, DON H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INGRAM, ANGELIA M

Defendants

THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

ELLIOTT, FRED SCOTT

WHITE, JOYCE V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARRASQUILLO, AMY WEBER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR FRED ELLIOTT, AND JOYCE WHITE

2/28/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR FRED ELLIOTT, AND JOYCE WHITE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

2/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLISION AVOIDANCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

2/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLISION AVOIDANCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO FRED SCOTT ELLIOTT AND JOYCE WHITE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 4/3/2020 10:44 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020017533

4/2/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO FRED SCOTT ELLIOTT AND JOYCE WHITE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 4/3/2020 10:44 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020017533

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1/27/2020: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 4/3/2020 6:58 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020017440

4/2/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 4/3/2020 6:58 AM / RECEPTION #: 2020017440

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED AS TO FRED SCOTT ELLIOTT ON 1.8.20

1/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED AS TO FRED SCOTT ELLIOTT ON 1.8.20

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- JOYCE V. WHITE SUB SERVED ON 1/7/2020

1/29/2020: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- JOYCE V. WHITE SUB SERVED ON 1/7/2020

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANGELIA INGRAM

2/14/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANGELIA INGRAM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

1/6/2020: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #16962

1/3/2020: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #16962

COMPLAINT

12/31/2019: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/31/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANGELIA INGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- JOYCE V. WHITE SUB SERVED ON 1/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED AS TO FRED SCOTT ELLIOTT ON 1.8.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 1.8.20

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK AS TO FRED SCOTT ELLIOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: AUTO NEGLIGENCE ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/31/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001447

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Standard Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRASQUILLO, AMY WEBER