This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 04/24/2021 at 17:05:43 (UTC).

HOLLIS, BELINDA vs. MARTIN, GAINES C

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 HOLLIS, BELINDA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MARTIN, GAINES C. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0156

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHARRIT, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOLLIS, HUNTER

HOLLIS, SOPHIA

HOLLIS, BELINDA

Defendants

MCINTYRE, STEVEN F

MIHAELA IONESCU, MD, PA

MARTIN, GAINES C

MORI, BEAN & BROOKS, INC.

MCGRAW, PETER

LAOS, LUIS

POKHAREL, SHRADHA

ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

MANDARIN PAIN SOLUTIONS, PLLC

ROTHSCHILD, M.D., CHESLOVAS

GAINES C. MARTIN, M.D., PH.D., P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAKOUR, FADI M.

Defendant Attorney

BARBOUR, JEPTHA F

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICATE/MEDICAID INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

4/12/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING MEDICATE/MEDICAID INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

4/12/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

4/9/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

4/7/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES STEVEN MCINTRYRE AND MANDARIN PAIN SOLUTIONS PLLC'S

4/7/2021: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES STEVEN MCINTRYRE AND MANDARIN PAIN SOLUTIONS PLLC'S

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS TO SHRADA POKHAREL MD AND MIHAELA IONESCU MD PA

4/7/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS TO SHRADA POKHAREL MD AND MIHAELA IONESCU MD PA

NOTICE OF SERVING CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

4/2/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINITFF DEFENDANT'S

4/1/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINITFF DEFENDANT'S

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

4/1/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER INC

3/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER INC

NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-30) ON DEFENDANT

3/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-30) ON DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON CHESLOVAS ROTHSCHILD

3/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON CHESLOVAS ROTHSCHILD

NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON MANDARIN PAIN SOLUTIONS, PLLC

3/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON MANDARIN PAIN SOLUTIONS, PLLC

NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON MORI, BEAN AND BROOKS, INC

3/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON MORI, BEAN AND BROOKS, INC

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SHRADHA POKHAREL

3/4/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SHRADHA POKHAREL

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER INC

3/4/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER INC

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO GAINES MARTIN

3/4/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO GAINES MARTIN

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT, CHESLOVAS V ROTHSCHILD MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANTS, STEVEN MCINTYRE AND MANDARIN PAIN SOLUTIONS, PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY SHRADHA POKHAREL MD AND MIHAELA IONESCU MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; FILED BY GAINES MARTIN AND GAINES MARTIN MD PHD PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORANGE PARK MEDICAL CENTER, INC'A ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT, SHRADA POKHAREL AND MIAELA IONESCU MD PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OVER DEFENDNAT STEVEN MCINTYRE'S AND MANDARIN PAIN SOLUTIONS, PLLC'S TENTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDNATS STEVEN MCINTYRE AND MANDARIN PAIN SOLUITONS, PLLC, SIXTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MIHAELA INOESCU, M.D, P.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO MANDARIN PAIN SOLUTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STEVEN MCINTYRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO GAINES C MARTIN, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO GAINES MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF CONTINGENCY FEE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #75268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/23/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000156

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROTHSCHILD, M.D., CHESLOVAS is a litigant

Latest cases where MORI BEAN AND BROOKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Orange Park Medical Center, Inc. Dba Orange Park Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chakour, Fadi