This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 23:31:42 (UTC).

GOAL PROPERTIES LLC OBO MNSF T2 SPE LLC vs. RENAE HOWELLS

Case Summary

On 12/02/2018 GOAL PROPERTIES LLC OBO MNSF T2 SPE LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RENAE HOWELLS. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2569

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOAL PROPERTIES LLC OBO MNSF T2 SPE LLC

Defendants

HOWELLS, RENAE

PIKE, PHILLIP

AULT, PEGGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUIKSHANK, ELIZABETH ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

12/2/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketEntry: Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as to Phillip Pike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as to Renae Howells

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: Eviction Summons Issued as Peggy Ault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint with Lease, Payment Ledger and 3 Day Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less