This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 08:45:48 (UTC).

Gerard Services Inc vs Scott Gendusa

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Gerard Services Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Scott Gendusa. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0559

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GERARD SERVICES INC

Defendant

GENDUSA, SCOTT

Garnishee

VYSTAR CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICKE, JEFF J

Defendant Attorney

TUPPER, MICHAEL ALEXANDER

Garnishee Attorney

FOLMAR, HAYLEY L ESQ

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Service as to Vystar Credit Union; Corporate Served 11/16/18

12/7/2018: Certificate of Service as to Vystar Credit Union; Corporate Served 11/16/18

Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing on 12/11/18 at 9:30am

11/29/2018: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing on 12/11/18 at 9:30am

Notice of Appearance

11/26/2018: Notice of Appearance

Certified Mail Receipt Not Signed

8/3/2018: Certified Mail Receipt Not Signed

Certified Mail Receipt

8/2/2018: Certified Mail Receipt

Clerks Cover Letter

8/1/2018: Clerks Cover Letter

Civil Cover Sheet

8/1/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: Satisfaction of Garnishment - Vystar Credit Union

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Closing on Reopened Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Final Judgment of Continuing Writ of Garnishment Vystar Credit - garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Final Judgment of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion To Strike Defendant's Claim of Exemption and Request for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Service as to Vystar Credit Union; Corporate Served 11/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing on 12/11/18 at 9:30am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit in Opposition to Defendant's Claim of Exemption emailed to JA for Judge's review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: Claim of Exemption/Request for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certified Mail Receipt Not Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Certified Mail Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Recording

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Clerks Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VYSTAR CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where GERARD SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Folmar, Hayley Lewis