This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 06:16:28 (UTC).

GARZA, TAMMY RENEE vs. BFF PUPPIES

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 GARZA, TAMMY RENEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BFF PUPPIES. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2508

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARZA, TAMMY RENEE

Defendant

MICHAEL KASSNOFF D/B/A BFF PUPPIES

 

Court Documents

EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED 11/18/19

11/20/2019: EXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED 11/18/19

STATEMENT / PLAINTIFF'S

11/7/2019: STATEMENT / PLAINTIFF'S

COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS

11/7/2019: COMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #9244

11/7/2019: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #9244

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/20/2019 3:33 PM / RECEPTION #: 2019067711

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • HearingSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.; Location: Courtroom 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketEXECUTED SUMMONS RETURNED CORPORATE SERVED 11/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED AND SENT TO CCSO WITH FEES FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT / PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT WITH EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #9244

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCLAIMS MORE THAN $500-LESS THAN $2500 ASSESSED $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/07/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019SC002508

    Read MoreRead Less