This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/10/2020 at 17:06:05 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs. THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTE

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1375

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

MOSBACH, PATRICK JOSEPH

MOSBACH, TIMOTHY A

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTE

CLERK OF THE COURT OF CLAY COUNTY, FLORIDA

MOSBACH, CHRISTOPHER HAROLD

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

1/30/2020: NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

1/30/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

COMPLAINT

12/12/2019: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES

12/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE OF FLORIDA, DOR

12/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE OF FLORIDA, DOR

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO PATRICK MOSHBACH

12/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO PATRICK MOSHBACH

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CHRISTOPHER MOSHBACH

12/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CHRISTOPHER MOSHBACH

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/16/2019 9:38 AM / RECEPTION #: 2019066351

12/12/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS/RECORDED - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/16/2019 9:38 AM / RECEPTION #: 2019066351

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

12/12/2019: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF ACTION

2/14/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF ACTION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

3/16/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

2/20/2020: ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

1/30/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

1/30/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

PAYMENT $965.00 RECEIPT #14648

12/16/2019: PAYMENT $965.00 RECEIPT #14648

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO TIMOTHY MOSBACH

12/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO TIMOTHY MOSBACH

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CLERK OF COURT OF CLAY COUNTY

12/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO CLERK OF COURT OF CLAY COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/12/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001375, FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS. THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTE WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKETS NAI-1/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; NON-SERVED SUMMONS TO CHRISTOPHER MOSBACH ON 1.13.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE; NON-SERVED SUMMONS TO PATRICK MOSBACH ON 1.13.20

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FEE ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: REAL PROPERTY MTG CLAIM MORE THAN 50,000 LESS THAN 250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/12/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001375

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk of the Court of Brwd Cty is a litigant

Latest cases where Freedom Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan