This case was last updated from Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/15/2022 at 17:03:05 (UTC).

FOWLER, CHRISTY vs. TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 FOWLER, CHRISTY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC. This case was filed in Clay County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0620

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOWLER, CHRISTY

Defendants

TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC.

CALHOUN, DARIUS THERON

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

BUTLER, WILLIAM REX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, AUSTIN T ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/16/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/16/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED ON TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC

6/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC

SUMMONS ISSUED ON DARIUS CALHOUN

6/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON DARIUS CALHOUN

SUMMONS ISSUED ON STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

6/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED ON WILLIAM BUTLER

6/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED ON WILLIAM BUTLER

PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #143637

6/17/2022: PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #143637

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING ORIGINAL INTERROGATORIESTO DEFENDANT, WILLIAM REX BUTLER

7/8/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING ORIGINAL INTERROGATORIESTO DEFENDANT, WILLIAM REX BUTLER

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESTO DEFENDANT, DARIUS THERON CALHOUN

7/8/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESTO DEFENDANT, DARIUS THERON CALHOUN

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING AMENDED ORIGINAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

7/8/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING AMENDED ORIGINAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESTO DEFENDANT,TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC.

7/8/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIESTO DEFENDANT,TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC.

DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

8/1/2022: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

8/1/2022: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/5/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN LAW FIRM AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRES FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONTO DEFENDANT, TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TODEFENDANTSTATE FARMMUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONTO DEFENDANT, DARIUS THEREON CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS INITIAL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONSTO DEFENDANT, DARIUS THERON CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONSTODEFENDANT, WILLIAM REX BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #143637

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON WILLIAM BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON DARIUS CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED ON TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/16/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA000620

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TLC TOTAL LAWN CARE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brown, Austin Tyler