This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County on 02/13/2020 at 23:59:41 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC vs KAREN DIANE RIGGS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KAREN DIANE RIGGS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County, Clay County Courthouse located in Clay, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COX, ANGELA M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0465

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Clay County

  • Courthouse:

    Clay County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COX, ANGELA M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS OFCHARLES L MCGLOTHLIN

KAREN DIANE RIGGS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

TENANT 2, UNKNOWN

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

TENANT 1, UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAVIESO, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Wells Fargo Bank, NA.

5/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Wells Fargo Bank, NA.

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Karen Diane Riggs, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Leroy McGlothlin

5/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Karen Diane Riggs, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Leroy McGlothlin

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Unknown Tenant 2

5/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Unknown Tenant 2

20 Day Summons Issued as to:Unknown Tenant #1

5/18/2018: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Unknown Tenant #1

Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

5/17/2018: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

5/17/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

5/17/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Executed Summons on Wells Fargo Bank on 05-22-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Letter of Cancellation of Service of Process and Return of Summons to Issuing Clerk of Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service Letter of Cancellation of Service of Process and Return of Summons to Issuing Clerk of Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Wells Fargo Bank, NA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Karen Diane Riggs, Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Leroy McGlothlin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Unknown Tenant 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: 20 Day Summons Issued as to:Unknown Tenant #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Designation of Primary E-Mail Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ditech Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER TRAVIESO