This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 21:42:04 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs Michael Newton

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Michael Newton. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0891

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

NEWTON, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: 09/07/2018 Default Final Judgment, Default Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: MOBLEY, KRISTINA K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing Supporting Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Certificate of Taxable Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet Defendant FTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit /Return Service NTA individually served 5/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: Order Appointing Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued 6/5/18 @ 1:00pm - issued from efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less