This case was last updated from Clay County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 09:51:38 (UTC).

Comenity Bank vs Evie Stephens

Case Summary

On 08/11/2018 Comenity Bank filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Evie Stephens. This case was filed in Clay County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Clay, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. and COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1723

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Clay County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Clay, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOBLEY, KRISTINA K.

COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMENITY BANK

Defendant

STEPHENS, EVIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ, J L

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

8/11/2018: Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 12/5/2019 11:02 AM / RECEPTION #: 2019064539

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Interest & Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit of Non-Military

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: Affidavit as to Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: Notice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: Docket Sheet pending stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Judge: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons Notice to Appear Issued issued from efile; Pretrial 9/11/18 at 1pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Motion to Appoint Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Summons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: Statement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less